Mariposa International (SG)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's activities support people who have experienced baby loss during pregnancy, at birth or in infancy and those journeying infertility. This is fulfilled by providing online and befriender support, counselling, resources, education, training, advocacy and Global Remembrance Events (240 to end of 2024), as well as campaigning for improvements in clinical care and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Australia
- Canada
- France
- Ireland
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Spain
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 06 March 2013: Standard registration
- 01 April 2019: Funds received from 1110902 POTTERS CROSS MINISTRIES
- MARIPOSA, SAYING GOODBYE (Working name)
- THE MARIPOSA TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Alei | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIE MICHELE WATTS | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JASON ALFRED EVANS | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ZOE ADELLE CLARK-COATES MBE | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN CLARK-COATES | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.95k | £62.51k | £126.41k | £140.14k | £229.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.31k | £117.73k | £82.33k | £121.78k | £163.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/03/2013 as amended on 27 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF IN NEED AND PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PARENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES AFFECTED BY GESTATIONAL LOSS, STILL BIRTH OR DEATH OF A BABY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE HOLDING OF COMMEMORATIVE SERVICES AND THE PROVISION OF A VARIETY OF SUPPORT SERVICES INCLUDING A NATIONAL TELEPHONE HELPLINE, BEFRIENDING GROUPS, COUNSELLING AND THERAPY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O CCEM
PO Box 6885
Stratford Upon Avon
Warwickshire
CV37 1WG
- Phone:
- 03003231350
- Email:
- office@sayinggoodbye.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window