BHUBESI PRIDE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bhubesi Pride Foundation is committed to harnessing the power of sport and education to unite communities, empower local talent and inspire long term, sustainable development. We achieve this through initiating sports programs and other legacy projects in impoverished areas of southern and eastern Africa alongside the delivery of annual training, resource provision and sports/education programs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Malawi
Governance
- 25 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chimwemwe John Gale | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Henry Mame | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Jackson | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rory James McGee | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ella May Mellersh Gibbs | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marco Yanda Nason Mama | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin Moore | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charles Thomas Line | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Edward Haynes | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel John Cottrell | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nick Robson | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
GRANT CONSTABLE | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300.37k | £281.14k | £411.77k | £133.47k | £214.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £270.69k | £284.90k | £228.52k | £289.79k | £202.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £60.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/07/2013 as amended on 14 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN AFRICA BY THE PROVISION OF COACHING AND EQUIPMENT FOR PLAYING SPORT AND WITH A VIEW TO: 1 UNITING CHILDREN THROUGH SPORT, ADDRESSING HEALTH EDUCATION AND LIFE SKILLS; 2 EMPOWERING LOCAL STAFF; AND 3 INSPIRING LONG TERM DEVELOPMENT THROUGH ESTABLISHING LINKS WITH KEY STAKEHOLDERS, SUCH AS SCHOOLS AND LOCAL COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mander Duffill Ltd
41-43 Market Place
CHIPPENHAM
Wiltshire
SN15 3HR
- Phone:
- 01249650441
- Email:
- richard@bpfafrica.org
- Website:
-
bpfafrica.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window