Financial history JUST JONES &

Charity number: 1151226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.10k £3.23k £3.06k £2.96k £49
Total expenditure £11.73k £3.29k £19.86k £2.99k £1.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A