Financial history FRIENDS OF TYNEMOUTH OUTDOOR POOL

Charity Number: 1151997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.56k £2.17k £871 £716 £3.38k
Total expenditure £15.28k £2.49k £2.72k £1.56k £731
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A