OXFORD STUDENT CONFERENCES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising TEDxOxford, a TEDx conference (x = independently organized TED event) where speakers from many different fields present short talks to an audience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 12 April 2013: CIO registration
- OXCON (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN MAN DOU WONG | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.21k | £29.67k | £1.50k | £22.79k | £22.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.04k | £42.40k | £3.70k | £22.86k | £20.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 December 2024 | 273 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 December 2024 | 273 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 05 June 2024 | 432 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 05 June 2024 | 432 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 05 June 2024 | 797 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 05 June 2024 | 797 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 05 June 2024 | 1162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 05 June 2024 | 1162 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Apr 2013
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION AND INTELLECTUAL EXCHANGE OF IDEAS WITH YOUNG ADULTS, BY ORGANISING AND EXECUTING TALKS AND CONFERENCES IN THE OXFORD AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ORIEL COLLEGE
ORIEL SQUARE
OXFORD
OX1 4EW
- Phone:
- 01865 559900
- Email:
- charity@tedxoxford.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window