MATHS ON TOAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maths education - we develop and deliver community and family maths activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 April 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wing Ka Karrie Liu | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Tanveer Singh Sian | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Elizabeth Huntley | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Joanne Watzek | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Francesca Mann | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2019 | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.11k | £99.52k | £100.75k | £52.60k | £58.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.27k | £77.43k | £82.34k | £76.09k | £132.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 AUG 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATHEMATICS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH EXHIBITIONS, INSTALLATIONS AND RELATED LEARNING ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Andy Nash Accounting
Unit 24-25
Goodsheds
Hood Road
BARRY
South Gl
- Phone:
- 0203 834 9678
- Email:
- info@mathsontoast.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window