Financial history QUINARY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1152737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £10.12k £20.00k £39 £315 £1.20k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £9.50k £1.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A