THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH MORETON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christ Church Moreton PCC is a Christian charity which undertakes a variety of activities in Moreton with wide ranging public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wirral
Governance
- 15 May 2013: Previously excepted registration
- CHRIST CHURCH, MORETON PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ronald Iveson | Chair | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Susan Sharp | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne Selby | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Iveson | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith William Culligan | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Hindle | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Stott | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Jane Yvonne Stocker | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Jill Mary Anders | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Smith | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Smith | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Holmes | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Jones | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip David Jones | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Fisher | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Ann Lawrence | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Debbi Stott | Trustee | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.35k | £98.39k | £134.94k | £98.58k | £114.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.06k | £103.44k | £141.48k | £101.50k | £136.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church Parish Centre
24 Upton Road
WIRRAL
CH46 0PA
- Phone:
- 01516040049
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window