Financial history BRITISH COMMUNITY HONOURS AWARDS

Charity number: 1152118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.82k £33 £500 £0 £8.53k
Total expenditure £16.01k £4.99k £3.64k £4.85k £10.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A