Financial history BISHOP WILTON SHOW

Charity number: 503460
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017
Total gross income £22.69k £17.81k £25.81k £24.71k £23.32k
Total expenditure £21.43k £23.58k £23.90k £22.50k £22.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0