CROSSROADS GLOBAL VILLAGE (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A non-profit brokerage helping link for-profit entities, with non-profit organisations, foundations, trusts and governments to combat global need. In addition Global Handicrafts operating on a fair trade basis, sells gifts and items in the UK; and Global X-perience programmes simulating poverty, hunger, oppression and the plight of refugees enabling participants to experience such need first hand.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 August 2013: Standard registration
- CROSSROADS; CROSSROADS GLOBAL VILLAGE; CROSSROADS FOUNDATION; GLOBAL HAND; GLOBAL HAND (UK) (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR BILL HAMPSON | Chair | 22 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Kim Elizabeth Elwell-Sutton | Trustee | 14 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin James Dillon | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Payne | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Natalya Hanley | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Caroline Davis | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.78k | £24.01k | £26.62k | £38.78k | £28.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.62k | £21.96k | £29.50k | £52.45k | £25.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 NOV 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/09/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR BY FACILITATING THE DONATION OF GOODS, SERVICES, EXPERTISE AND SKILLS, AND THE PRACTICAL INTEREST AND INVOLVEMENT OF COMPANIES, FIRMS AND INDIVIDUALS, IN FURTHERING THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF: (A) RELIEVING AND ASSISTING THE VICTIMS OF WAR, CONFLICT AND NATURAL, MAN-MADE OR COMPLEX DISASTER, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD, MEDICAL AID, ACCOMMODATION, ACCESS TO WATER AND SANITATION AND OTHER HUMANITARIAN ASSISTANCE; (B) PREVENTING AND RELIEVING POVERTY IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR BY ACTIVITIES THAT HELP ALLEVIATE POVERTY AND DISEASE IN RESOURCE POOR SETTINGS IN THE WORLD; (C) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (D) ADVANCING HEALTH OR SAVING LIVES; (E) RELIEVING THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; (F) ADVANCING HUMAN RIGHTS, CONFLICT RESOLUTION OR RECONCILIATION OR PROMOTING RELIGIOUS OR RACIAL HARMONY OR EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (G) ADVANCING ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT; OR (H) PROMOTING THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR. 2. TO PROMOTE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO VICTIMS OF WAR, CONFLICT AND NATURAL, MAN-MADE OR COMPLEX DISASTER BY AID AND TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF DISABILITY, TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND SAVING OF LIVES, TO ADVANCE ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT, AND TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING EXPERIENTIAL LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES, FACILITIES AND EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES WHICH ENABLE PARTICIPANTS TO DEVELOP THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF AND EMPATHY TOWARDS ISSUES RELATING TO POVERTY, HUMANITARIAN NEED AND DISASTER RESPONSE. VOLUNTARY SECTOR SHALL MEAN ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD WHICH ARE FURTHERING PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW AND OTHER INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH IN EACH CASE ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR DOES NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Capital Office
124-128 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 020 3389 7177
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window