INDEPENDENT COMMUNITY AUTISM ACTIVITY NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
I CAAN is a group of volunteers that organise activities for people with autism and their families in Allerdale and Copeland
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 07 April 2014: Standard registration
- I CAAN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY TOMLINSON | Chair | 22 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MILBURN | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHANI MICHELLE TOMLINSON | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE THORNTON | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE PARKER | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
LISA CLARE BURRELL | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUNE STOTHERS | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MILBURN | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.79k | £2.46k | £1.11k | £2.31k | £17.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.91k | £1.94k | £6.43k | £8.08k | £5.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 12 September 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 AUG 2011 AS AMENDED ON 13/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO ARE DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY AFFECTED BY AUTISM IN THE WEST CUMBRIA (ALLERDALE AND COPELAND) AREA BY PROVIDING ACTIVITIES FOR THOSE WHO SUFFER FROM AUTISM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THOSE AFFECTED BY AUTISM TO MEET AND PROVIDE MUTUAL SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
WEST CUMBRIA (ALLERDALE AND COPELAND) AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 81
COCKERMOUTH
CA13 3AQ
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- info@icaan.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window