Governance OXFORDSHIRE SOUTH & VALE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1150766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 11 February 2013: Standard registration
  • 19 September 2013: Funds received from 1119505 HENLEY AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
  • 02 December 2013: Funds received from 1145422 ABINGDON AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
  • 03 December 2013: Funds received from 1121264 THAME & DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
  • 25 June 2014: Funds received from 1104233 THE DIDCOT & DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property