ARR FOUNDATION LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To protect, preserve & support nature & the environment, biodiversity, endangered species & related research. To further scientific research & the development of environmental & ecological friendly technologies. To support public availability of information regarding animals, animal safety, animal rights & the environment. To protect people from rogue, dangerous animals.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Kenya
- Poland
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 05 June 2014: Standard registration
- 05 September 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- ANIMAL RIGHTS RESERVED LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 AUG 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/02/2014
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PEOPLE LIVING AND WORKING IN AREAS OF ANIMAL HABITATION ABOUT THE WELFARE OF ANIMALS, THE IMPORTANCE OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE DANGERS OF HUMAN ENCROACHMENT AND THE NEGATIVE EFFECTS OF HIGH LEVELS OF POACHING; AND 2)TO PROMOTE THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF ANIMALS IN THEIR NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY WORKING TO REDUCE THE NEGATIVE EFFECTS OF HUMAN DEVELOPMENT ON WILD ANIMALS AND THEIR NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND BY SUPPORTING LOCAL RESCUE CENTRES TO PROVIDE A RESCUE SERVICE FOR INJURED ANIMALS, OR RELOCATING ANIMALS WHERE THERE IS A RISK THEY MAY ENDANGER HUMANS OR THOSE ANIMALS AT RISK FROM POACHING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window