COLLAGE ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To use of the arts, to improve lives in United Kingdom and European area for the public benefit promoting regeneration in areas of social or economic deprivation by any or all of the following means: -promoting and fostering the development of artistic tastes and knowledge and the understanding and appreciation of the arts. - developing a community spirit by organising exhibitions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,468,630
Donations and legacies | £482.87k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £35 | |
Other | £985.73k |
Total expenditure:
£1,328,694
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.33m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £59,000 from 2 government contract(s) and £30,290 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.33m | |
Retained for future use | £139.94k |
People

12 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 August 2013: Standard registration
- 16 March 2015: Funds received from 248470 HARINGEY ARTS COUNCIL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP SHERMAN | Chair | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ARCHITA KUMAR | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Yana Stajno | Trustee | 29 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
YOUSAF ALI KHAN | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
VASANTHI HIRANI | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN RICHARDSON | Trustee | 01 December 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.61m | £1.45m | £1.99m | £1.73m | £1.47m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68m | £1.62m | £1.96m | £1.79m | £1.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £59.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £185.62k | N/A | £30.29k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £466.01k | £0 | £646.81k | £482.87k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £63.43k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.56m | £0 | £1.89m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £466.01k | £0 | £646.81k | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £35 | |
|
Income - Other | £42.43k | £986.55k | £34.90k | £1.09m | £985.73k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.68m | £1.62m | £1.96m | £1.79m | £1.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.00k | £6.00k | £6.48k | £6.96k | £6.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £1.62m | £607.54k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £705.10k | £724.74k | £729.16k | £733.81k | £715.66k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £491.47k | £477.79k | £484.11k | £493.96k | £432.06k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £886.93k | £1.06m | £1.04m | £1.11m | £889.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 December 2020 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 December 2020 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/08/1993 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/07/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/08/2013
Charitable objects
1) TO FOSTER, PROMOTE, DEVELOP AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC RESIDENT, WORKING OR STUDYING IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA, IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: - THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A PUBLIC ARTS FACILITY (CURRENTLY KNOWN AS THE CHOCOLATE FACTORY); - THE PROVISION AND ORGANISATION OF EXHIBITIONS, LITERATURE, MUSIC, COMEDY, THEATRE EVENTS AND COMMUNITY FESTIVALS; - THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING IN THE ARTS, PARTICULARLY AMONGST PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, DISABILITY, ILL-HEALTH, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE - THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT AND THE CREATION OF EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES. 2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY BY USING ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS, THEORETICAL AND APPLIED, TO IMPROVE LIVES IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COLLAGE ARTS
COLLAGE ARTSPACE 2
4 COBURG ROAD
WOOD GREEN
LONDON
N22 6UJ
- Phone:
- 0800 009 2970
- Email:
- info@collage-arts.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window