HUMANITY DIRECT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity allows contributions to be paid directly to medical specialists, normally the hospital, in third world countries to have operations that would not otherwise be available to the people concerned. These operations are usually in the worlds remotest areas. The charity is also running a glasses program, carrying out eye tests and providing glasses to children in third world countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- China
- Mozambique
- Somalia
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 04 June 2013: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Swift | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marc Shalam | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATRINA SUZANNE SWIFT | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.93k | £69.68k | £330.31k | £134.11k | £55.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.73k | £69.53k | £98.05k | £148.14k | £78.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 09 December 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 09 December 2020 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/06/2013
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1.1 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING LIFE-CHANGING SURGERIES TO THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL DISADVANTAGE; AND 3.1.2 SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 New Elvet
DURHAM
DH1 3AL
- Phone:
- 02080991092
- Email:
- hello@humanitydirect.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window