YATE & SODBURY DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Yate and Sodbury district U3A is an organisation which provides life-enhancing and life-changing opportunities. Retired and semi-retired come together and learn together not for qualifications but for its own reward: the sheer delight of discovery. Members share their skills and experiences, the learners teach and teachers learn and there is no distinction between them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 30 January 2013: Standard registration
- YATE & SODBURY DISTRICT U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr William Patrick Campbell Mills | Chair | 21 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Isobel Smith | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Kevin Horatio Wilkinson | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Alison Young | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Morrison-Jones | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Leslie Day | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Haig Sarafian | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Collett | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marian longley | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
linda Barbara Broad | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marion Phillips | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Mullholland | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.24k | £28.06k | £14.42k | £14.97k | £13.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.47k | £27.28k | £10.16k | £14.56k | £14.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | £1.00k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 198 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/09/2007 AS AMENDED ON 16/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44
Chapel Lane. Old Sodbury.
Old Sodbury
Bristol
- Phone:
- 07743 653753
- Email:
- jkhw1962@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window