PUMPING MARVELLOUS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a)In partnership with a range of health agencies to create patient-driven initiatives. b)Advocacy services at a local, regional and national level via regional volunteers c)Lobbying MPs about the increasing cost of heart failure to the health economy d)Using coaching and support of patients to promote, self-care/education/intervention e)Providing information via a website on the Internet
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 May 2013: Standard registration
- 26 February 2015: Funds received from 1145140 PUMPING MARVELLOUS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Graves | Chair | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Louise Shaw | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Dunne | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Cleverley | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
KAREN HARTSHORNE-EVANS | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
PIERRE DALE | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
LAURA CHADWICK | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN RICHARDS EVANS | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £278.81k | £427.80k | £441.46k | £701.69k | £360.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.31k | £293.43k | £332.21k | £583.79k | £455.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £672.59k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.05k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £22.31k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £735 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £571.77k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.02k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.18k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JAN 2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM OR AT RISK OF HEART FAILURE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: * EDUCATING HEART FAILURE PATIENTS AND THEIR CARERS TO MANAGE THE LONG TERM EFFECTS OF THE CONDITION * ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SYMPTOMS AND TREATMENT OF HEART FAILURE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 111 Business First
Millennium City Park
Millennium City Road
Preston
LANCASHIRE
PR2 5BL
- Phone:
- 01772796542
- Email:
- hearts@pumpingmarvellous.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window