ENTERPRISE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing enterprise support for start-up businesses thus enabling individuals to create employment, focussing on giving the disadvantaged an advantage. Focus on providing low cost business accommodation for the most under-represented in our society. Provide small grants in the form of subsidised rent to new start-ups in our Enterprise Centres. Offer support and mentoring for a 3 year term.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2015
Total income:
£801,595
Donations and legacies | £46.31k | |
Charitable activities | £754.54k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £3 | |
Other | £738 |
Total expenditure:
£888,875
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £797.59k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £91.28k | |
Charitable expenditure | £797.59k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Kent
- Leeds City
Governance
- 07 March 2013: Standard registration
- 19 May 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £303.50k | £801.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.05k | £888.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £46.31k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £754.54k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £3 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £738 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £797.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £91.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £5.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £307.47k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £76.78k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £350.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | |||
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | |||
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | |||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/12/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 2.1 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY UNEMPLOYMENT AMONGST THOSE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, ETHNICITY, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, EX-SERVICEMEN AND WOMEN, EX-OFFENDERS AND CRAFT WORKERS, IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT AND INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 2.1.1 THE PROVISION OF LAND AND BUILDINGS AT BELOW MARKET AND/OR SUBSIDISED LEVELS TO EXISTING BUSINESSES TO PROTECT JOBS, ESPECIALLY RETAINING STAFF AND AVOIDING REDUNDANCIES WHEN OTHERWISE JOBS WOULD BE LOST, AND REDUCE UNEMPLOYMENT OR INCREASE JOB OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE UNEMPLOYED, AND START-UP BUSINESSES TO CREATE NEW JOBS, ESPECIALLY FOR THE LONG-TERM UNEMPLOYED AND THE DISADVANTAGED; AND 2.1.2 THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, TRAINING AND ASSISTANCE TO UNEMPLOYED INDIVIDUALS CONCERNING SELF-EMPLOYMENT AND TO EXISTING BUSINESSES TO ENCOURAGE THE CREATION OF NEW JOBS FOR THE UNEMPLOYED, ESPECIALLY THE LONG-TERM UNEMPLOYED AND THE DISADVANTAGED 2.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE, EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ALL ASPECTS OF EFFECTIVE SMALL BUSINESS MANAGEMENT, SMALL BUSINESS SUPPORT, WORKSPACE MANAGEMENT, TRADITIONAL CRAFTS AND ARTISAN SKILLS, AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISE AND ITS PUBLIC DISSEMINATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THROUGH RESEARCH AND TRAINING IN ITS THEORY AND PRACTICAL APPLICATION THROUGH WORK EXPERIENCE THROUGH ITS OPERATION AND THROUGH GENERAL PUBLICATION; 2.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF TRADITIONAL CRAFTS AND ARTISAN SKILLS AND THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO THOSE WHO PRACTICE SUCH CRAFTS AND SKILLS; 2.4 THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT AND WORKSPACES, AND PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO REDUCE RELIANCE ON DONATIONS AND DIVERSIFY INCOME STREAMS; 2.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF INDUSTRY, COMMERCE AND ENTERPRISE WHICH: (A) RELIEVES POVERTY; (B) RELIEVES UNEMPLOYMENT; (C) ADVANCES HEALTH; (D) ADVANCES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT; AND (E) ADVANCES CITIZENSHIP OR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT? MEANS DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS. 2.6 THE SUPPORT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT, SUBJECT TO APPROVAL BY A RESOLUTION OF THE MEMBERS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window