THE KING'S ARMS CHURCH CAMBORNE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE KINGS ARMS CHURCH IS A CHRISTIAN CHURCH IN CAMBORNE. THE CHURCH HOLDS REGULAR SUNDAY AND MID-WEEK MEETINGS FOR MEMBERS AND VISITORS ALIKE. OUR ACTIVITIES INCLUDE PASTORAL, YOUTH AND CHILDREN'S WORK, AND RUNNING A SURF AND YOUTH CLUB. THE CHURCH IS INVOLVED FROM TIME TO TIME WITH VARIOUS SOCIAL ACTION INITIATIVES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 19 February 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terence Brannigan | Chair | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Carter | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Darryn Moulding | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Fiona Marshall | Trustee | 05 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.35k | £20.17k | £13.52k | £6.44k | £5.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.32k | £19.02k | £13.91k | £6.29k | £3.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Feb 2013
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CIO; (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Penscowen Road
CAMBORNE
Cornwall
TR14 0DT
- Phone:
- 07983221486
- Email:
- jfmarshall0311@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window