HOPE CHURCHES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF HOPE CHURCH MALMESBURY, PROVIDING SERVICES OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP OPEN TO ALL EVERY SUNDAY. OUTREACH ACTIVITIES TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND LIFE SKILLS IN MALMESBURY AND THE SURROUNDING TOWNS AND VILLAGES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 06 March 2013: CIO registration
- 11 May 2017: Funds received from 1104860 SANCTUARY CHRISTIAN CHURCH
- HOPE CHURCH MALMESBURY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Edmund John Faithfull | Chair | 29 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Susan Jones | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Cambray-Smith | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
David George Jones | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.25k | £59.21k | £55.70k | £49.86k | £42.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.54k | £51.66k | £40.70k | £53.66k | £47.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Mar 2013 as amended on 26 May 2019 as amended on 26 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN SCHEDULE A. TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOPE CHURCH
17 Hunloke Way
MALMESBURY
SN16 9FL
- Phone:
- 01666260815
- Email:
- info@thehope.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window