ABERAVON SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to advance the mental, physical and spiritual welfare of young people by promoting a scheme of awards and their personal development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 23 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAROLD WORTH | Chair | 01 February 2013 |
|
|||||
KEVIN JOHN WHILE | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Worth | Trustee | 01 August 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.91k | £57.92k | £12.61k | £35.92k | £49.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.33k | £38.92k | £25.26k | £42.79k | £45.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.94k | £34.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUL 1967 AS AMENDED ON 03/06/2013
Charitable objects
TO SAVE LIFE BY PREVENTION OR RESCUE AND TO PROMOTE THE METHODS OF SURF LIFE SAVING AND FIRST AID FOR RESUSCITATION OF THE RESCUED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O T. Lang & Sons (Aberavon) Ltd
Graham Davies House
Addison Road
Port Talbot
Neath Port Talbot County Borough
SA12 6HZ
- Phone:
- 07968036168
- Email:
- thomaskinsale@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window