SOUTHWELL MUSIC FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1153135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Southwell Music Festival istaking place for the first time in 2014,and is planned as an annual, top-quality classical music festival, to celebrate classical music, and to raise the profile of the town and its magnificent mediaeval Minster. The Festival performances will be centred at Southwell Minster, and in the historic Great Hall.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £193,025
Total expenditure: £192,262

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 July 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kristin Eleanor McIntosh Trustee 22 November 2024
None on record
Peter Stephen Garrood Trustee 22 November 2024
None on record
Amanda Farr Trustee 22 November 2024
None on record
SARAH ELIZABETH HALL Trustee 22 November 2024
NEW PERSPECTIVES THEATRE COMPANY
Received: On time
THE LANDMARK TRUST (AUCHINLECK) LIMITED
Received: On time
Carris Jones Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Patrick Massey Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
Flynn John Brayn Le Brocq Trustee 01 January 2022
NOTTINGHAM YOUTH ORCHESTRA LTD
Received: On time
Dr MARGARET CHADWICK Trustee 16 April 2013
NOTTINGHAM YOUTH ORCHESTRA LTD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £80.98k £178.21k £180.63k £187.41k £193.03k
Total expenditure £58.97k £174.19k £188.21k £163.56k £192.26k
Income from government contracts N/A £47.94k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £27.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 25 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 25 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 November 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 November 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
47 EASTHORPE
SOUTHWELL
NG25 0HY
Phone:
01636330014