Financial history 64TH BIRMINGHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 503482
Charity reporting is up to date (40 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.14k £27.77k £65.94k £48.67k £65.95k
Total expenditure £14.08k £5.46k £41.94k £64.21k £71.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.74k £10.67k £6.24k £35.86k