Trustees SOUTH HAMPSTEAD JUNIOR SCHOOL HARDSHIP FUND LIMITED
Charity number: 1152059

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nallini Puri | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Grady | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Rachel Spencer | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Allison Ford Bright | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Critchley | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amy Rynehart | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL GLATMAN | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Haylings | Trustee | 21 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.