HUGUENOTS OF SPITALFIELDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Producing and circulating three newsletters a year to twelve hundred people - Huguenot walks in London and Huguenot Towns - Primary school educational programme - Huguenot Month festival - Partnerships with other Huguenot organisations - Journeymen weavers houses campaign
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 26 April 2013: Standard registration
- 20 July 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 July 2023: Funds transferred to 1070623 THE FRENCH PROTESTANT CHURCH OF LONDON
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.71k | £15.60k | £29.68k | £8.15k | £10.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.56k | £28.99k | £19.36k | £16.69k | £27.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/03/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATIONS OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN, WORKING IN OR VISITING SPITALFIELDS, TOWER HAMLETS AND THE CITY OF LONDON, BY PROMOTING HUGUENOT CULTURE AND HERITAGE IN SPITALFIELDS AND TO FURTHER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT THE PURPOSES OF ANY CHARITY WHOSE OBJECTS INCLUDE ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HUGUENOT HERITAGE AND CULTURE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window