CITY OF WAKEFIELD GOLF CLUB

Charity number: 1151091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND FITNESS OF THE PUBLIC (WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, GENDER, AGE, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGIOUS OR SIMILAR BELIEF) BY PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION THROUGH PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING GOLF AT THE GASKELL SPORTS PAVILION OR SUCH OTHER VENUE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £87,086
Total expenditure: £81,769

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Wakefield

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 March 2013: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Fuller Trustee 20 October 2023
None on record
Michael Davis Trustee 28 October 2022
None on record
fiona smart Trustee 28 October 2022
None on record
Richard Garner Trustee 28 October 2022
None on record
David Emmott Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £37.01k £26.25k £41.69k £81.83k £87.09k
Total expenditure £36.71k £16.32k £36.48k £106.01k £81.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 December 2024 325 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2022 361 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
City of Wakefield Golf Club
Horbury Road
WAKEFIELD
WF2 8LG
Phone:
01924373450