CHLOE'S AND SOPHIE'S SPECIAL EARS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We brighten the lives of Deaf children. We aim to provide an everlasting impact on their wellbeing and mental health by overcoming challenges, creating experiences and empowering individuals to be their best selves.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bracknell Forest
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- Wrexham
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 March 2013: Standard registration
- CSSEF (Working name)
- CHLOE'S AND SOPHIE'S SPECIAL EAR FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Peter Rainbird | Chair | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Chocian | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Lee | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
CERI MARIE RISE | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Garrett | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GEORGE JACKSON | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.08k | £171.86k | £254.34k | £310.60k | £278.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.93k | £113.26k | £180.60k | £290.67k | £391.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £28.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 14 October 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 14 October 2022 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO RAISE DEAF AWARENESS IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND TO IMPROVE THE EDUCATION OF DEAF CHILDREN IN MAINSTREAM SCHOOLS BY PROVIDING DEAF EQUIPMENT, DEAF RESOURCES AND MATERIALS TO IMPROVE THE SOUND ACOUSTICS IN THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CSSEF Wellbeing Hub
Manor Chambers
304 High Street
Aldershot
Hampshire
GU12 4LT
- Phone:
- 07935056499
- Email:
- karenjackson@cssef.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window