HOMELESS CAT RESCUE BEDFORDSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HCR cover cat and kitten rescue. All cats are neutered and microchipped before going to their new homes. A follow-up service for kittens aged 6+ months to encourage neutering is performed.We educate the public, reinforcing the importance of neutering, vaccinating and micro-chipping cats.We also trap, neuter and release feral cats, helping to humanely reduce the number of unwanted cats.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Luton
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 24 July 2013: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACKIE BEAN | Chair | 25 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALISON MORRELL | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vikki Miller | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.70k | £24.68k | £23.83k | £24.32k | £21.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.17k | £23.72k | £17.49k | £24.87k | £26.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Jul 2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS AND KITTENS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR BY: · THE RESCUE REHABILITATION AND RE-HOMING OF ABANDONED CATS AND KITTENS · THE NEUTER AND RELEASE OF FERAL CATS TO HUMANELY CONTROL COLONIES. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG CATS AND KITTENS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 Watling Gardens
Dunstable
LU6 3FD
- Phone:
- 07801556794
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window