EGGINTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Renting of village hall to local school and community groups Acting as Corporate Trustee of Egginton Parish Institute
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 24 June 1963: Standard registration
- AS ABOVE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR HENRY JOHN MICHAEL EVERY Bt FCA | Chair | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul William Brown | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Sayer | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Joanne Czechowski | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS WRIGHT | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN PARKINSON | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN ROBERT BURD | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.80k | £30.50k | £31.09k | £35.29k | £27.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.61k | £40.79k | £23.16k | £29.50k | £22.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 May 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 May 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/04/2013
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF EGGINTON, DERBYSHIRE AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES; AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR USE AS A SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR FOR THE CHILDREN OF INHABITANTS OF EGGINTON AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES. 3. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF EGGINTON AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Linked charities
- 24 June 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Fishpond Lane
Egginton
DERBY
DE65 6HJ
- Phone:
- 447808097429
- Email:
- mike.sayer@molsoncoors.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window