INCREDIBLE KIDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Incredible Kids is a Christian charity providing play and support to any family with a child or young person with a disability or additional need to strengthen and support family life, reduce inequality and social isolation. Activities include daytime family play sessions for young people with additional needs and their siblings in a supported environment with advice and support for parent-carer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,600 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 11 March 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER MAY PREWETT CPFA | Chair | 14 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jaime Samantha Breitnauer | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Fletcher | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.03k | £68.20k | £393.79k | £109.70k | £118.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.02k | £63.22k | £85.41k | £117.37k | £118.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £49.00k | N/A | £6.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Mar 2013
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS; AND 2. PROVIDING RELIEF AND RESPITE TO THE FAMILY AND CARERS OF THE CHILDREN; THESE OBJECTS SHALL BE FURTHERED IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING CARE FOR THE CHILDREN AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO SOCIALISE AND PLAY TOGETHER; AND B) ALLOWING PARENTS AND CARERS TO TAKE A SHORT BREAK FROM THE PRESSURES OF EVERYDAY LIFE AND ENCOURAGING A MUTUALLY SUPPORTIVE ENVIRONMENT FOR PARENTS AND CARERS. WE DEFINE THOSE WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS AS CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE A PHYSICAL, SENSORY, COMMUNICATION, BEHAVIOURAL OR LEARNING DIFFICULTY, OR HAVE A LONG TERM/LIFE LIMITING CONDITION
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lockleaze Youth & Play Space
Romney Avenue
BRISTOL
BS7 9TD
- Phone:
- 07766252320
- Email:
- incrediblekidsuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window