PASTURES COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of NN2 and surrounding areas and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 04 March 2013: Standard registration
- 06 March 2023: Funds received from 267188 DUSTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- PASTURES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN MARRIOTT | Trustee | 20 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIA CLARE SNEDKER | Trustee | 20 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.08k | £40.81k | £50.81k | £56.11k | £43.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.49k | £5.61k | £11.07k | £17.52k | £20.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £22.41k | £17.67k | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO: 1) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 2) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; 3) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 ROOKERY LANE
NORTHAMPTON
NN2 8BX
- Phone:
- 01604847873
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window