Financial history LUNGI SIERRA LEONE

Charity number: 1150980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/01/2020 15/01/2021 15/01/2022 15/01/2023 15/01/2024
Total gross income £24.29k £22.03k £5.33k £26.72k £5.36k
Total expenditure £29.13k £15.70k £7.90k £35.09k £12.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A