Accounts and annual returns FOREST GATE CHURCH

Charity number: 1151147
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 27 November 2024 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 27 November 2024 58 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 26 October 2023 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 26 October 2023 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 31 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 23 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window