Financial history CENTRE FOR ISLAMIC GUIDANCE

Charity number: 1151640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £67.08k £73.79k £80.31k £89.62k £84.23k
Total expenditure £66.84k £55.39k £60.60k £82.61k £78.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k N/A N/A N/A