THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD CORNERSTONE PARISH LOUGHBOROUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities include - Providing a place of Christian worship and community centre - Alleviation and relief of poverty through its charitable activities - Providing pastoral care for the needy and vulnerable by providing access to advocacy, advice and information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 06 February 2013: Standard registration
- RCCG CORNERSTONE PARISH LOUGHBOROUGH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR TAIWO ENOCH OLUGBENGA | Chair | 05 February 2013 |
|
|||||
DR ADEBAYO OLUFEMI OLA | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Pastor Biodun Olaitan | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS OLUFNMILOLA AJIBOLA | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHUKWUKA ECHEZONA DURU | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.54k | £29.70k | £42.53k | £58.43k | £90.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.14k | £29.02k | £31.53k | £47.91k | £23.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 MAY 2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
John Storer Charnwood
John Storer House
Wards End
LOUGHBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE11 3HA
- Phone:
- 07882715246
- Email:
- pastor@rccglboro.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window