Financial history TREOWEN COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1151380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £108.67k £22.66k £11.58k £10.05k £9.58k
Total expenditure £97.06k £14.23k £13.18k £11.31k £17.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k £50 N/A N/A