NEWNHAM COMMUNITY LIBRARY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of library and associated services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 03 July 2013: Standard registration
- NCL (Working name)
- NEWNHAM COMMUNITY LIBRARY LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL GEORGE PENNY | Chair | 03 March 2013 |
|
|||||
Patrick Stephen O'Leary | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET FAIRCLOTH | Trustee | 03 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.85k | £12.56k | £10.21k | £10.70k | £12.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.46k | £11.78k | £10.21k | £18.00k | £12.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.56k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £12.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 September 2024 | 219 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/06/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF NEWNHAM COMMUNITY LIBRARY LTD IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF NEWNHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE MAINTENANCE AND OPERATION OF A COMMUNITY LIBRARY AND ASSOCIATED SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOUNT SEVERN COTTAGE
CHURCH ROAD
NEWNHAM
GL14 1AX
- Phone:
- 01594517207
- Email:
- newnhamlibrary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window