FAITHS TOGETHER IN LAMBETH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Faiths Together in Lambeth is an independent, borough-wide body, fostering constructive relationships among faith communities and promoting faith and multi-faith involvement in civic life by: Fostering understanding. Promoting social cohesion. Coordinating social action. Working with public bodies for the benefit of all. Functioning as a resource for faith communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lambeth
Governance
- 13 February 2014: Standard registration
- FTIL (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALEHA BEGUM JAFFER | Chair | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Venerable Konchok Thubten | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Steffan Idris Mano Mathias MA PHD AKC | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|||||
VIV ISAAC | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHANDRAWATTI BISESSAR | Trustee | 23 May 2017 |
|
|||||
MOHAMMED ASLAM IJAZ | Trustee | 12 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAYED RAZAWI | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE BACKUS | Trustee | 22 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.23k | £13.46k | £2.50k | £20.95k | £5.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.67k | £9.92k | £5.17k | £20.28k | £4.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.99k | N/A | N/A | £18.35k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.90k | £1.00k | N/A | £2.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 NOV 2009 AS AMENDED ON 11/12/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS; AND (B) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS”
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 HOLMEWOOD GARDENS
LONDON
SW2 3RS
- Phone:
- 07889221847
- Email:
- ftil@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window