THE HEREFORD CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission of Hereford Civic Society is to encourage high standards of architecture and town planning in Hereford. In pursuit of these aims we work with the Local Authority on built environment matters, scrutinise planning applications, hold regular public meetings, publish a quarterly newsletter and organise study visits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 16 August 1974: Standard registration
- HEREFORD CIVIC TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY JAMES MILLN | Chair | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Leaton | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marcelle Denise Lloyd-Hayes | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Bucknell | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan George Bucknell | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN BARNINGHAM FOWLER FCCA | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR BEN NASH | Trustee | 30 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.17k | £1.59k | £2.45k | £2.80k | £2.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.16k | £774 | £1.63k | £1.56k | £2.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 SEPTEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED 23 OCTOBER 2002 AND 4 JUNE 2003.
Charitable objects
IN THE CITY OF HEREFORDSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDINGS - 1. TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AND GIVE RELATED ADVICE AND INFORMATION. 3. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF HEREFORD AND ITS SURROUNDINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Venns Lane
HEREFORD
HR1 1DE
- Phone:
- 01432 371663
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window