NISHKAM HEALTHCARE TRUST

Charity number: 1154295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The development of healthcare facilities in form of cultural healthcare provision.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 October 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • NONE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr MANVIR KAUR KALIRAI Chair 13 March 2013
None on record
Paul Warwick Jennings Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Dr SARABJIT SINGH CHANDAN Trustee 13 March 2013
None on record
Dr BRINDER SINGH MAHON Trustee 13 March 2013
None on record
RANJIT SONDHI Trustee 13 March 2013
PMA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
HOPE PROJECTS (WEST MIDLANDS) LTD
Received: On time
SOUTH ASIAN DIASPORA LITERATURES AND ARTS ARCHIVE (SALIDAA)
Received: On time
THE COLE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GUIDE DOGS FOR THE BLIND ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
BIRMINGHAM RACE IMPACT GROUP
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.23m £1.16m £1.63m £1.37m £1.52m
Total expenditure £1.12m £1.14m £1.31m £1.39m £1.68m
Income from government contracts N/A £13.09k £1.43m £1.08m £1.17m
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £15.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £30.88k £40.86k £30.00k £30.00k £97.16k
Income - Other trading activities £1.15m £1.07m £1.60m £1.34m £1.42m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £48.85k £49.40k £0 £0 £2.97k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £86.06k £90.67k £165.40k £145.51k £219.36k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.04m £1.05m £1.15m £1.24m £1.46m
Expenditure - Governance £7.62k £5.70k £5.70k £5.70k £7.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £32.84k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £109.59k £95.85k £87.77k £80.16k £107.38k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £21.79k
Other assets £581.87k £621.80k £986.22k £1.02m £756.68k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £202.68k £209.51k £248.82k £290.38k £209.32k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 February 2024 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Nishkam Healthcare Centre
21 Soho Road
Handsworth
Birmingham
B21 9SN
Phone:
07812732857