MEANWHILE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meanwhile Foundation exists to turn empty property costs into social value. Working with partner organisations, it supports Meanwhile Use by taking the risk on empty property in which projects delivered can support the company objectives. Activities include business support, space for community projects, training and skills development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 May 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Andrew White | Chair | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Baldwin | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gabriela Spangenthal | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Berwyn | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Tsang | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Hearn | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SCOTT ALCOCK | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £325.09k | £36.08k | £12.09k | £45.14k | £9.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.47k | £131.92k | £12.23k | £34.98k | £7.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £324.90k | £35.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR THE PARTNERSHIP AREAS) BY ALL OF OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.1.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT; 3.1.2 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; 3.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RETRAINING PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE AND SUPPORT WHERE PRACTICAL AND NECESSARY; 3.1.4 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: 3.1.4.1 IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR 3.1.4.2 TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 3.1.5 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 3.1.6 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; 3.1.7 THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO, BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; 3.1.8 THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; 3.1.9 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; 3.1.10 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION; AND 3.2 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; AND 3.3 THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71-75 Albion Street
London
SE16 7JA
- Phone:
- 02077374135
- Email:
- info@meanwhile.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window