THE MARK SELIGMAN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make donations to charitable institutions and to apply income and capital for charitable purposes, at the discretion of the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 March 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Donald SELIGMAN | Chair | 15 March 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
GEORGE EDWARD SPENCER SELIGMAN | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
LOUISE ANGELA MARY SELIGMAN MA | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.00k | £15.00k | £2.50k | £51.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.80k | £20.88k | £2.23k | £10.18k | £18.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 FEB 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES, AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, AT SUCH TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Kynance Mews
LONDON
SW7 4QR
- Phone:
- 07798802049
- Email:
- markdseligman@aol.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window