CHARITY IT LEADERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual Conference, Quarterly Meetings, Special Interest Groups, Discussion Forums, informal collaborations between members, promotes best practice through shared learning both to members and to the wider sector through invitations to speak at conferences and write articles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 August 2013: CIO registration
- CITL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jane Crighton | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Huntington | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Seth Abraham Harman | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart McSkimming | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Carruthers | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Kay Moore | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Andrew Curry | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Simon Edmonds | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Robert Edwards | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Lynne Hoskins | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Bailey | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.51k | £91.41k | £108.95k | £139.05k | £169.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.45k | £93.32k | £122.25k | £151.68k | £133.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 05 Aug 2013 as amended on 23 Oct 2019 as amended on 10 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF STUDY, SHARING OF KNOWLEDGE AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE USE OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Rodliffe Accounting Ltd
37th Floor
1 Canada Square
Canary Wharf
London
- Phone:
- 01625664545
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window