AL HAYAT LANGUAGES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
english language centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £39,275 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 10 June 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAVID KHAN | Chair | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHAZAD KHAN | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Amir Shafiq | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
RAFIQUE MALIK | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
IFTAB HUSSAIN | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £280.88k | £331.65k | £286.98k | £239.27k | £253.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.50k | £346.63k | £263.99k | £340.25k | £289.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £60.98k | £246.61k | £89.05k | £15.00k | £39.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 October 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 October 2024 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 September 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 September 2023 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/05/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, DISABILITY,HEALTH STATUS, RELIGIOUS OR POLITICAL AFFILIATION, RACE, SEX OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE TEACHING AND LIFELONG LEARNING, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE SUBJECTS OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO ATTEND COURSES AND ADVICE ON THE LIFE IN THE UK TEST AS DEFINED IN ARTICLE 1; AND (B) (I) TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDENTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; (II) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUCH PEOPLE; (III) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR SUCH PEOPLE FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND ASSISTING THEIR INCLUSION INTO THE WIDER COMMUNITY PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A DROP IN CENTRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cambridge House
84-86 Randal Street
BLACKBURN
BB1 7LG
- Phone:
- 01254433736
- Email:
- info@alhayatlanguages.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window