COLCHESTER FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foodbank exists to prevent or relieve poverty in Colchester and the surrounding area, in particular but not exclusively, by providing emergency food supplies to individuals with assessed short-term need and/or to charities or other organisations working towards the same aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £19,900 from 5 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Essex
Governance
- 12 June 2013: Standard registration
- NONE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Tibber | Chair | 05 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Mark Norrington | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Rusiecki | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.27k | £393.65k | £257.94k | £381.87k | £377.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.36k | £143.69k | £124.45k | £208.59k | £271.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £26.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.40k | £16.19k | N/A | £19.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10/06/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN COLCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD SUPPLIES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 The Mews
35 Harwich Road
COLCHESTER
CO4 3BP
- Phone:
- 01206515508
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window