C.R.E.W HEART SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Heart Support organisation looking to the after care & support of Pre and existing Cardiovascular patients through initial Cardiac Rehabilitation stages and thereafter as a provider of exercise and walking facilities for all people who are at risk of future CV problems . This includes Carers/Families and Friends who wish to help Heart Health charities in our areas of benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
- Oldham
Governance
- 05 April 2013: Standard registration
- 17 March 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- CARDIACREHABILITAIONEXERCISEWALKING (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2014 | 28/02/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.01k | £15.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.12k | £8.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2015 | 18 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | 31 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JAN 2013
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND TO ASSIST IN PREVENTION AND REHABILTATION OF ALL PERSONS WHO HAVE, OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF DEVELOPING CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE, RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN YORKSHIRE AND LANCASHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window