Accounts and annual returns SHALOM EVANGELICAL MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1153447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 07 May 2025 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 02 October 2024 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 07 June 2023 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required