SHALOM EVANGELICAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1153447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Hospital Ministry, Supporting Community Welfare, sharing the Gospel and Distributing Gospel leaflets

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £460
Total expenditure: £420

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Reading

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 August 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SEM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SAMUEL ODUEKUN Chair 28 February 2013
None on record
MARY ODUEKUN Trustee 28 February 2013
None on record
DAVID JUSTIN ABRAHAM Trustee 28 February 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £702 £1.20k £70 £700 £460
Total expenditure £695 £1.10k £60 £680 £420
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 07 May 2025 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 02 October 2024 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 07 June 2023 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
33 AMBROOK ROAD
READING
RG2 8SL
Phone:
07717172156