EXETER NORTHCOTT THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exeter Northcott Theatre serves a catchment of 551,000 homes from its home on the University of Exeter's Streatham Campus with a programme of touring drama, dance, opera, music, comedy and family theatre . A flagship for the city, the theatre plays a vital role in Exeter's cultural life acting as a magnet for thousands of people of all ages interested in attending and taking part in live theatre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£3,272,806
Donations and legacies | £105.15k | |
Charitable activities | £2.70m | |
Other trading activities | £445.06k | |
Investments | £19.13k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,280,681
Raising funds | £171.44k | |
Charitable activities | £3.11m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £190,300 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £171.44k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.11m |
People

67 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 12 April 2013: Standard registration
- 19 March 2024: Funds received from 263944 BARNFIELD THEATRE LTD
- EN THEATRE COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mia Katja Hodge | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Paul Begbie | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Peka | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jane Rebecca Milling | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elghady | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rececca Chapman | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Gordon Anthony-Edwards | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas Balcombe | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.24m | £1.25m | £2.97m | £2.91m | £3.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.02m | £1.19m | £2.79m | £2.97m | £3.28m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £217.30k | £498.03k | £370.10k | £192.58k | £190.30k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £73.39k | £31.18k | £47.60k | £111.07k | £105.15k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £275.49k | £20.75k | £254.49k | £430.58k | £445.06k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.89m | £1.20m | £2.66m | £2.20m | £2.70m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £381 | £35 | £325 | £4.05k | £19.13k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £172.16k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £2.02k | £2.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.75m | £1.18m | £2.55m | £2.75m | £3.11m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £266.12k | £18.88k | £236.94k | £219.26k | £171.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.49k | £9.22k | £19.25k | £31.81k | £17.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £109.56k | £94.47k | £110.57k | £176.98k | £135.50k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.13m | £1.42m | £1.54m | £1.79m | £1.72m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £382.60k | £605.81k | £559.96k | £925.96k | £824.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/08/2013 as amended on 20 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE THE PROMOTION OF PERFORMING AND VISUAL ARTS IN ALL THEIR FORMS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): (A) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR REHEARSING AND STAGING PERFORMANCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; (B) THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC IN ARTS PRODUCTION AND MANAGEMENT; AND (C) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE PERFORMING AND VISUAL ARTS IN ALL THEIR FORMS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTHCOTT THEATRE
STOCKER ROAD
EXETER
EX4 4QB
- Phone:
- 01392722412
- Email:
- info@exeternorthcott.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window